VA SB1487 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Alkaline hydrolysis; registration; regulations. Establishes a registration requirement for alkaline hydrolysis providers. The bill defines alkaline hydrolysis and adds alkaline hydrolysis and hydrolyzed remains to statutes dealing with cremation and cremains. The bill grants the Board of Funeral Directors and Embalmers the power to inspect alkaline hydrolysis providers and their operations. The bill requires the Board of Funeral Directors to consult with the Department of Environmental Quality, the Department of Health, and representatives of wastewater treatment facilities and funeral service associations to promulgate regulations related to alkaline hydrolysis. Alkaline hydrolysis; registration; regulations. Establishes a registration requirement for alkaline hydrolysis providers. The bill defines alkaline hydrolysis and adds alkaline hydrolysis and hydrolyzed remains to statutes dealing with cremation and cremains. The bill grants the Board of Funeral Directors and Embalmers the power to inspect alkaline hydrolysis providers and their operations. The bill requires the Board of Funeral Directors to consult with the Department of Environmental Quality, the Department of Health, and representatives of wastewater treatment facilities and funeral service associations to promulgate regulations related to alkaline hydrolysis.
Title
Alkaline hydrolysis; establishes registration requirement, regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1487E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23104087D-E |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 23104087D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 291.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 309.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2808.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2808.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2814.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2818.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |