VA SB1486 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Report of law-enforcement officer involved in accident. Provides that any law-enforcement officer who is listed as a driver in a motor vehicle accident report submitted to the Department of Motor Vehicles will not have the accident listed on his driving record if he was driving a motor vehicle provided by a law-enforcement agency in the course of his employment and was operating the motor vehicle in the performance of his official duties at the time of such accident. This bill is identical to HB 2336.
Title
Law-enforcement officer; report of officer involved in accident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 821 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1486ER2) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1486ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103284D |