VA SB1485 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0852)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Long-Term Employment Support Services and Extended Employment Services. Directs the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to make referrals to any employment services organization that provides competitive or commensurate wages and is eligible to receive state-funded Long-Term Employment Support Services or Extended Employment Services. The bill also requires the Department to develop and implement a referral process for individuals who make an informed choice to pursue an employment outcome that is not considered a competitive integrated employment setting by the Department. The bill also establishes the Employment Service Organization Steering Committee as an advisory board in the executive branch of state government. The bill provides that the purpose of the Committee shall be to report to and advise the Commissioner for Aging and Rehabilitative Services on policy, funding, and the allocation of funds to employment services organizations for Long-Term Employment Support Services and Extended Employment Services. This bill is identical to HB 2306.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Long-Term Employment Support Services and Extended Employment Services; referral.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (17-Y 21-N) (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0852)
2019-04-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 852 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03SenateCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (17-Y 21-N)
2019-03-25SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1485ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-11HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-07HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenatePrinted as engrossed 19101100D-E
2019-01-25SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1485E
2019-01-25SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-25SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-25SenateRead second time
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101100D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515169.1(n/a)See Bill Text
515169.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1485
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1485+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1485E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1485ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0852+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0102+SB1485
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0172SB1485+SB1485
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0201SB1485+SB1485
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0129+SB1485
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2627+SB1485
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0574SB1485+SB1485
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1154SB1485+SB1485

Bill Comments

feedback