VA SB1480 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System; conservation officers. Adds conservation officers of the Department of Conservation and Recreation as members of the Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System. The bill makes conservation officers eligible to accrue retirement benefits under the Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System only for creditable service on and after July 1, 2019. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriations act.
Title
Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System; conservation officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19102066D-E |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1480E |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1480E |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102066D |