VA SB148 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB148

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Driving under the influence. Provides that the provisions regarding driving or operating a motor vehicle, engine, or train while intoxicated and the provisions regarding operating a motor vehicle by a person under the age of 21 after illegally consuming alcohol shall not apply to any person driving or operating a motor vehicle on his own residential property or the curtilage thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driving under the influence; provisions regarding driving or operating a motor vehicle, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-02-19HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20101417D-E
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB148E
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReported from Judiciary with amendments (12-Y 1-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-12-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101417D

Same As/Similar To

SB148 (Carry Over) 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182266(n/a)See Bill Text
182266.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback