VA SB1479 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Claims; Keith Allen Harward. Provides relief in the amount of $1,548,439 to Keith Allen Harward, who was incarcerated from 1983 until 2016 after being convicted of first degree murder. In 2016 he was granted a Writ of Actual Innocence by the Supreme Court of Virginia based upon DNA evidence that excluded Mr. Harward as the perpetrator of the crime. Mr. Harward's relief would be paid as follows: (i) an initial lump sum of $309,688 to be paid within 60 days immediately following the execution of a release by Mr. Harward from any present or future claims he may have and (ii) the sum of $1,238,751 to purchase an annuity before October 1, 2017, for the primary benefit of Mr. Harward with the terms structured in his best interests. In addition, the bill entitles Mr. Harward to receive up to $10,000 for tuition for career and technical training within the Virginia Community College System. This bill is identical to HB 1650.
Title
Relief; Keith Allen Harward.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 658 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1479ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103998D |