VA SB1478 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Disposition of the remains of a decedent; right to control. Establishes a priority order for the right to control the disposition of the remains of a decedent; the location, manner, and condition of disposition; and the arrangements for funeral goods and services to be provided, as well as circumstances that would forfeit this right. The bill establishes procedures for resolving disagreements among those who have the right to control and provides liability protections for licensed funeral establishments, funeral service licensees, registered crematories, or registered crematory operators that rely in good faith upon the instructions of an individual claiming the right of disposition.
Title
Disposition of the remains of a decedent; right to control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102960D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2807.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2807.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2825 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |