VA SB1474 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Resisting arrest; penalty. Expands the Class Resisting arrest; penalty. Expands the Class 1 misdemeanor of resisting arrest to include, in addition to fleeing from a law-enforcement officer, attempting to escape from the lawful custody of a law-enforcement officer by force or violence.
Title
Arrest; resisting law-enforcement officers, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17103154D-E |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1474E |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103154D |