VA SB1470 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1470

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0359)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicle registration; special communication needs indicator. Expands eligibility for a special communication needs indicator on a vehicle registration to vehicle owners whose vehicle is regularly occupied by an individual who has a disability that can impair communication. Current law authorizes those vehicle owners who have a disability that can impair communication to apply for such an indicator. The bill authorizes the removal of such indicator by request in writing to the Department of Motor Vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle registration; special communication needs indicator.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0359)
2021-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 359 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1470ER)
2021-02-19SenateEnrolled
2021-02-16HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HouseRead third time
2021-02-15HouseRead second time
2021-02-11HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenatePrinted as engrossed 21102537D-E
2021-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1470E
2021-02-02SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-02SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-02SenateRead second time
2021-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
2021-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-22SenatePresented and ordered printed 21102537D

Same As/Similar To

SB1470 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
HB1960 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
HB1960 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462600.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1470
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1470+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1470E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1470ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0359+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1470AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1470F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1470FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1470FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S11C0027+SB1470
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0217SB1470+SB1470
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0282SB1470+SB1470
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H19V0005+SB1470
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1596+SB1470

Bill Comments 750

feedback