VA SB1469 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0353)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Timber sales; theft; accounting; penalty. Provides that a person who buys and removes timber from a landowner's property is guilty of timber theft if he fails to pay the landowner by the date specified in their agreement or, if there is no written agreement, within 60 days of removing the timber. The bill provides that a person who is convicted of timber theft is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor and shall be ordered to pay three times the value of the timber removed in addition to any penalties imposed by the court. The bill provides that, following the passing of the payment deadline, a buyer's failure to pay within 10 days of receiving a demand for payment shall constitute prima facie evidence of the buyer's intent to violate the timber theft provision. An exception exists for a purchaser who made payment to a person he believed in good faith to be the rightful owner of the timber.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Timber theft; theft, accounting, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0353)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 353 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1469ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19SenateTitle replaced 19106962D-H1
2019-02-19SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1469H1
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106962D-H1
2019-02-15HouseRead third time
2019-02-14HouseRead second time
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106962D-H1
2019-02-13HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1469S1
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106124D-S1
2019-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-01SenateCommittee amendments rejected
2019-02-01SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-01SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106124D-S1
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-17SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104311D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011105(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1469
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1469+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1469S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1469H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1469ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0353+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0021+SB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0166+SB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1469+SB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0320SB1469+SB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0085+SB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2846+SB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2858+SB1469
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0799SB1469+SB1469

Bill Comments

feedback