VA SB1467 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0711)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0711)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Central absentee voter precincts; expedited counting of absentee ballots. Allows the officers of election at a central absentee voter precinct to begin tallying the absentee ballots that are counted by hand at any time after 3:00 p.m. on the day of the election. Currently, absentee ballots may be processed at the central absentee voter precinct prior to the closing of the polls but shall not be counted until after the polls have closed. The bill prohibits any counts of tallies to be determined or transmitted outside of the central absentee voter precinct until after the closing of the polls. It also prohibits the use of cell phones and other communication devices during such tallying and until the close of polls. Any persons present in the central absentee voter precinct during this time is required to sign a statement under oath that he will not transmit any counts prior to the closing of the polls. Any person who transmits any counts in violation of the provisions of the bill is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Central absentee voter precincts; expedited counting of absentee ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0711) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 711 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1467ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title replaced 17105257D-H1 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1467H1 |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105257D-H1 |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105257D-H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1467S1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104748D-S1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Incorporates SB1503 (Favola) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104748D-S1 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103917D |