VA SB1464 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Power Innovation Fund and Program; created. Creates the Virginia Power Innovation Fund with funding to be used solely for the purposes of research and development of innovative energy technologies, including nuclear, hydrogen, carbon capture and utilization, and energy storage. The bill also creates the Virginia Power Innovation Program to use moneys from the Fund to (i) establish a Virginia nuclear innovation hub and (ii) award competitive grants to support energy innovation.
Title
Virginia Power Innovation Fund and Program; created.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 4-N) (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (9-Y 7-N) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (9-Y 7-N) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505) | |
2023-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 505 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1464ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 4-N) |
2023-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 4-N) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 23107467D-S1 |
2023-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2023-02-23 | House | Delegates: O'Quinn, Wilt, Hayes |
2023-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Saslaw, Lewis, Vogel |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | House requested conference committee |
2023-02-23 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2023-02-22 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute (86-Y 12-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1464H1 |
2023-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23107227D-H1 |
2023-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-16 | House | Substitute bill reprinted 23107227D-H1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 23107227D-H1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23103588D-E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1464E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Vogel agreed to |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (9-Y 7-N) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 23103588D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2386 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
HB2386 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
HB2386 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)