VA SB1459 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administration of state government; prohibited applications and websites. Prohibits any employee or agent of any public body or person or entity contracting with any such public body from downloading or using any application, including TikTok or WeChat, or accessing any website developed by ByteDance Ltd. or Tencent Holdings Ltd. (i) on any government-issued device or government-owned or government-leased equipment, including mobile phones, desktop computers, laptop computers, tablets, or other devices capable of connecting to the Internet, or (ii) while connected to any wired or wireless Internet network owned, operated, or maintained by the Commonwealth. Administration of state government; prohibited applications and websites. Prohibits any employee or agent of any public body or person or entity contracting with any such public body from downloading or using any application, including TikTok or WeChat, or accessing any website developed by ByteDance Ltd. or Tencent Holdings Ltd. (i) on any government-issued device or government-owned or government-leased equipment, including mobile phones, desktop computers, laptop computers, tablets, or other devices capable of connecting to the Internet, or (ii) while connected to any wired or wireless Internet network owned, operated, or maintained by the Commonwealth.
Title
Administration of state government; prohibited applications and websites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 29-N) (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 25-N) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 25-N) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0768) | |
2023-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768) | |
2023-04-12 | House | Enacted, Chapter 768 (effective 7/1/23) |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB1459ER2) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1459ER2) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2023-04-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 29-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (65-Y 29-N) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1459ER) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (74-Y 25-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed House (74-Y 25-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (12-Y 9-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2023-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Chair votes Yes |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1459E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23103506D-E |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 23103506D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Computer Services and Uses
Counties Cities and Towns
Law-Enforcement Officers
Police State
Computer Services and Uses
Counties Cities and Towns
Law-Enforcement Officers
Police State