VA SB1458 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1458

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Secretary of Commerce and Trade; Identity Management Standards Advisory Council. Transfers the management of the Identity Management Standards Advisory Council from the Secretary of Administration to the Secretary of Commerce and Trade. The bill also adds to the membership of the Advisory Council a representative from the Commonwealth of Virginia Innovation Partnership Authority and a representative of Virginia consumers. The bill also allows the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to serve ex officio with voting privileges. Secretary of Commerce and Trade; Identity Management Standards Advisory Council. Transfers the management of the Identity Management Standards Advisory Council from the Secretary of Administration to the Secretary of Commerce and Trade. The bill also adds to the membership of the Advisory Council a representative from the Commonwealth of Virginia Innovation Partnership Authority and a representative of Virginia consumers. The bill also allows the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to serve ex officio with voting privileges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identity Management Standards Advisory Council; transfers management of Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 258 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1458ER)
2021-02-22SenateEnrolled
2021-02-18HouseVOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N)
2021-02-18HousePassed House (98-Y 1-N)
2021-02-18HouseRead third time
2021-02-17HouseRead second time
2021-02-15HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (17-Y 4-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-20SenatePresented and ordered printed 21102388D

Same As/Similar To

SB1458 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22436(n/a)See Bill Text
22437(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1458
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1458+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1458ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0258+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1458F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1458FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0043+SB1458
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0184SB1458+SB1458
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0228SB1458+SB1458
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H21V0005+SB1458
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1725+SB1458

Bill Comments 750

feedback