VA SB1458 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0547)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0547)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Claims; Richard Hitt; Chares P. Jarrett. Provides relief to Richard Hitt and to Chares P. Jarrett for not receiving the Virginia Retirement System benefits that are based on Hazardous Duty service when they were led to believe that certain purchased service would be counted as Hazardous Duty and, therefore, qualify them for the hazardous duty supplemental benefits. The bill authorizes the Virginia Retirement System to pay the hazardous duty supplement to Mr. Hitt and Mr. Jarrett as outlined in subsection B of §51.1-206.
Title
Claims; Richard Hitt and Charles P. Jarrett.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0547) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 547 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1458ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Title replaced 11105338D-H1 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1458H1 | |
2011-02-24 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105338D-H1 | |
2011-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105338D-H1 | |
2011-02-21 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight and Government Activities | |
2011-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1458S1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104909D-S1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104909D-S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11103703D |