VA SB1456 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1456
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; eligibility for commitment to the Department of Juvenile Justice; eligibility for predispositional confinement in a secure facility. Provides that a juvenile may be committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice (the Department) only if he (i) is adjudicated delinquent of a violent juvenile felony and is 11 years of age or older or (ii) is 14 years of age or older. The bill provides that no juvenile younger than 11 years of age may be detained in a secure facility prior to an order of final disposition unless he is alleged to have committed a violent juvenile felony; in such case, the juvenile may only be detained in an approved foster home, a facility operated by a licensed child welfare agency, or another suitable place designated by the court and approved by the Department, but under no circumstances shall such juvenile be detained in a secure detention facility. Juveniles; eligibility for commitment to the Department of Juvenile Justice; eligibility for predispositional confinement in a secure facility. Provides that a juvenile may be committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice (the Department) only if he (i) is adjudicated delinquent of a violent juvenile felony and is 11 years of age or older or (ii) is 14 years of age or older. The bill provides that no juvenile younger than 11 years of age may be detained in a secure facility prior to an order of final disposition unless he is alleged to have committed a violent juvenile felony; in such case, the juvenile may only be detained in an approved foster home, a facility operated by a licensed child welfare agency, or another suitable place designated by the court and approved by the Department, but under no circumstances shall such juvenile be detained in a secure detention facility.
Title
Juveniles; eligibility for commitment to the Department of Juvenile Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115) | |
2021-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 115 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1456ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed House with amendment (58-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21102423D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1456 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 248.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |