VA SB1455 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

State Board of Elections; membership; appointment of Commissioner of Elections. Increases the membership of the State Board of Elections from three members to five members and increases the terms of Board members from four years to five years. Representation shall be given to each of the political parties having the highest and next highest number of votes in the Commonwealth at the preceding gubernatorial election, with three Board members being of the party of the Governor. Terms are initially staggered. The bill also grants to the Board the authority to appoint the Commissioner of Elections, subject to confirmation by the General Assembly, and to remove the Commissioner of Elections. The appointment or removal of the Commissioner shall require an affirmative vote of four of the five Board members. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020. This bill is identical to HB 1620.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, State Board of; membership, appointment of Commissioner of Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendations #'s 1,2,3,4,5,7,8,9,10,11,12,13,14,16 (8-Y 30-N) (Y: 8 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #6 and #15 (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 4/3/19
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1455ER2)
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendations #6 and #15 (98-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendations #'s 1,2,3,4,5,7,8,9,10,11,12,13,14,16 (8-Y 30-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendations #6 and #15 (38-Y 0-N)
2019-03-26SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1455ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 46-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (51-Y 46-N)
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Ransone, Cole, Rush, Lindsey
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Vogel, Barker, Chafin
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-20SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2019-02-20SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1455H1
2019-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106749D-H1
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106749D-H1
2019-02-15HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2019-02-04HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (35-Y 2-N)
2019-01-25SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1455S1
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105523D-S1
2019-01-25SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-25SenateRead second time
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105523D-S1
2019-01-22SenateIncorporates SB1311 (Edwards)
2019-01-22SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100854D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242101.2(n/a)See Bill Text
242101.5(n/a)See Bill Text
242102(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1455
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1455+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1455S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1455H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1455ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1455ER2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0079+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0172SB1455+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0210SB1455+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1801V0027+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0092+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3020+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0890SB1455+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0985SB1455+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3313+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1110SB1455+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1141SB1455+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1142SB1455+SB1455
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3433+SB1455

Bill Comments

feedback