VA SB1453 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1453
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revision of Titles 45.1 and 67. Creates proposed Title 45.2 (Mines, Minerals, and Energy) as a revision of existing Title 45.1 (Mines and Mining) and existing Title 67 (Virginia Energy Plan). Proposed Title 45.2 consists of 21 chapters divided into five subtitles: Subtitle I (Administration), Subtitle II (Coal Mining), Subtitle III (Mineral Mines), Subtitle IV (Gas and Oil), and Subtitle V (Other Sources of Energy; Energy Policy). The bill organizes the laws in a more logical manner, removes obsolete and duplicative provisions, and improves the structure and clarity of statutes pertaining to the administration of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy, underground and surface coal mining, underground and surface mineral mines, the Virginia Gas and Oil Act, energy from wind, solar, geothermal, and nuclear sources, and energy policy. The bill moves the remaining provisions of Title 67 that are not appropriate for inclusion in proposed Title 45.2 into other existing titles of the Code. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2021, and is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission. Revision of Titles 45.1 and 67. Creates proposed Title 45.2 (Mines, Minerals, and Energy) as a revision of existing Title 45.1 (Mines and Mining) and existing Title 67 (Virginia Energy Plan). Proposed Title 45.2 consists of 21 chapters divided into five subtitles: Subtitle I (Administration), Subtitle II (Coal Mining), Subtitle III (Mineral Mines), Subtitle IV (Gas and Oil), and Subtitle V (Other Sources of Energy; Energy Policy). The bill organizes the laws in a more logical manner, removes obsolete and duplicative provisions, and improves the structure and clarity of statutes pertaining to the administration of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy, underground and surface coal mining, underground and surface mineral mines, the Virginia Gas and Oil Act, energy from wind, solar, geothermal, and nuclear sources, and energy policy. The bill moves the remaining provisions of Title 67 that are not appropriate for inclusion in proposed Title 45.2 into other existing titles of the Code. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2021, and is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Mines and Mining and Virginia Energy Plan; revision of Titles 45.1 and 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 387 (effective 10/1/21) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1453ER) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21101563D-E |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1453E |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Edwards agreed to |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21101563D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1453 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1332 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1333 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 221.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 399 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1051 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1649 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 2119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1820.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1951.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 2133.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 195.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 195.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |