VA SB1452 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Possession or distribution of marijuana for medical purposes; affirmative defense for treatment of certain conditions. Provides an affirmative defense to prosecution for possession of marijuana if a person has a valid written certification issued by a practitioner for cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil for treatment of, or to alleviate the symptoms of, cancer. Under current law, only the treatment of intractable epilepsy is covered by the affirmative defense.
Title
Marijuana; possession or distribution for medical purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 2-N 3-A) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 2-N 3-A) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 2-N 3-A) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103729D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 250.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |