VA SB1449 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Executory Real Estate Contracts Act. Creates the Virginia Residential Executory Real Estate Contracts Act establishing provisions applicable to such contracts. The bill defines a residential executory real estate contract as an installment land contract, lease option contract, or rent-to-own contract by which a purchaser acquires any right or interest in real property other than a right of first refusal and occupies or intends to occupy the property as his primary residence. The bill also provides for the Board for Housing and Community Development to develop and make available on its website best practice provisions for residential executory real estate contracts. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Executory Real Estate Contracts Act; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1449ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20SenateTitle replaced 19106630D-H1
2019-02-20SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1449H1
2019-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106630D-H1
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106630D-H1
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104069D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1449
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1449+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1449H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1449ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0511+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0048+SB1449
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0151SB1449+SB1449
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0178SB1449+SB1449
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0179SB1449+SB1449
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0180SB1449+SB1449
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1102V0026+SB1449
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0260+SB1449
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2952+SB1449
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2995+SB1449
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0877SB1449+SB1449

Bill Comments

feedback