VA SB1448 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cambridge Advanced Exams; course credit. Requires the governing boards of each public institution of higher education to implement policies regarding the granting of credit for Cambridge Advanced Exams. The bill also clarifies that students should be eligible for credit for International Baccalaureate and Advanced Placement examinations, not courses.
Title
Cambridge Advanced Exams; course credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 545 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1448ER) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 16-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Passed House (81-Y 16-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11104190D-E | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1448E | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11104190D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1910 (Same As) 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)