VA SB1447 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Roanoke Higher Education Authority; board of trustees. Removes the president of Bluefield College from the board of trustees of the Roanoke Higher Education Authority. This bill is identical to HB 2379.
Title
Roanoke Higher Education Authority; removes president of Bluefield College from board of trustees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 307 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1447ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103297D |
Subjects
Authorities
Bluefield College
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Bluefield College
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions