VA SB1445 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1445ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Facilitate the administration of the COVID-19 vaccine; emergency. Facilitates the administration of the COVID-19 vaccine. The bill requires the Department of Health (the Department) to establish a program to enable eligible health care providers to volunteer to administer the COVID-19 vaccine to residents of the Commonwealth during a state of emergency related to the COVID-19 pandemic declared by the Governor. The bill defines "eligible health care provider" and provides that the program shall include (i) a process by which an eligible health care provider may register to participate in the program and (ii) the training requirements for participating eligible health care providers related to the administration of the COVID-19 vaccine, including training on the intramuscular injection of the COVID-19 vaccine and contraindications and side effects of the COVID-19 vaccine. The bill specifies requirements that the Department shall ensure that each site at which COVID-19 vaccinations are administered by eligible health care providers satisfies. The bill also requires the Department to establish a process by which entities, including medical care facilities, hospitals, hospital systems, corporations, businesses, pharmacies, public and private institutions of higher education, localities, and any other professional or community entity operating in the Commonwealth, may volunteer their facilities as sites at which the COVID-19 vaccine may be administered to residents of the Commonwealth. The bill permits a public institution of higher education or a private institution of higher education in the Commonwealth to volunteer to provide assistance to the Department and local health departments for data processing, analytics, and program development related to the COVID-19 vaccine through the use of its employees, students, technology, and facilities. The bill also permits localities with fire departments, emergency medical services departments, and volunteer rescue squads to establish and staff vaccine administration clinics. The bill provides civil and criminal immunity to individuals and professional entities acting pursuant to the bill and contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19; facilitates vaccine administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1445ER)
2021-02-08SenateEnrolled
2021-02-04SenateTitle replaced 21103925D-H1
2021-02-04SenateHouse substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (94-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HousePassed House with substitute with amendment (94-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB1445H1
2021-02-01HouseAmendment by Delegate Sickles agreed to
2021-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103925D-H1
2021-02-01HouseRead third time
2021-02-01HousePassed by temporarily
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103925D-H1
2021-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-22SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-01-22SenatePrinted as engrossed 21103452D-ES1
2021-01-22SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1445ES1
2021-01-22SenateAmendment by Senator Mason agreed to
2021-01-22SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-01-22SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103452D-S1
2021-01-22SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-22SenateRead second time
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103452D-S1
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed with emergency clause 21103261D

Same As/Similar To

HB2333 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2333ER)
HB2333 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2333ER)

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1445
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1445+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1445S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1445ES1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1445H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1445ER+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1445AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103915D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103452D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1445AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1445AHE
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1445FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0051+SB1445
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0077+SB1445
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0080SB1445+SB1445
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0081SB1445+SB1445
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0082SB1445+SB1445
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1321+SB1445
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0316SB1445+SB1445

Bill Comments 750

feedback