VA SB1444 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1444
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance; special report for large pre-legislative session contributions; contributions in aggregate. Directs any candidate for a statewide office or the General Assembly to file a report, not later than January 15, of any single contribution in excess of $1,000, or any combination of contributions with an aggregate value in excess of $1,000 from a single person, that is knowingly received by the candidate between January 1 and the first day of a regular session of the General Assembly. Any contributions included on this report do not have to be reported on any subsequent campaign finance report. Under current law, only single contributions in excess of $1,000 are required to be disclosed on this special pre-legislative session report.
Title
Campaign finance; special report for large pre-legislative session contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 36-N) (Y: 2 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 36-N) (Y: 2 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 343 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1444ER) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-27 | House | VOTE: Agreed To (96-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-27 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 21200803D-S2 |
2021-02-27 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2021-02-25 | House | Delegates: Simon, Askew, Rush |
2021-02-25 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Saslaw, Deeds, Suetterlein |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | House requested conference committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 36-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed House with substitute (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB1444H1 |
2021-02-22 | House | Substitute by Delegate Simon agreed to 21200542D-H1 |
2021-02-22 | House | Substitute by Delegate Simon withdrawn 21200428D-H2 |
2021-02-22 | House | Floor substitute printed 21200428D-H2 (Simon) |
2021-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | House | Floor substitute printed 21200542D-H1 (Simon) |
2021-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1444S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21104324D-S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB1377 (Suetterlein) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21104324D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21103238D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1444 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote