VA SB1444 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Campaign contributions; filing of finance reports. Changes the reporting requirement from any single contribution of $1,000 or more to all financial activity of a campaign committee of a candidate for a statewide office or the General Assembly knowingly received or reported by the candidate or his treasurer on behalf of his candidacy during the period beginning January 1 and ending on the day immediately before the first day of a regular session of the General Assembly to be reported to the State Board of Elections not later than January 15. Under current law, such single contributions of $1,000 or more during such time period are also required to be included in the next report of the candidate, but under the bill, none of the financial activity reported for such time period is required to be reported on any subsequent report. Campaign contributions; filing of finance reports. Changes the reporting requirement from any single contribution of $1,000 or more to all financial activity of a campaign committee of a candidate for a statewide office or the General Assembly knowingly received or reported by the candidate or his treasurer on behalf of his candidacy during the period beginning January 1 and ending on the day immediately before the first day of a regular session of the General Assembly to be reported to the State Board of Elections not later than January 15. Under current law, such single contributions of $1,000 or more during such time period are also required to be included in the next report of the candidate, but under the bill, none of the financial activity reported for such time period is required to be reported on any subsequent report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign finance reports; special report of pre-legislative session contributions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1444S1
2021-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21104324D-S1
2021-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-05SenateRead second time
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateIncorporates SB1377 (Suetterlein)
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104324D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 21103238D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242947.10(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback