VA SB1444 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Restricted ammunition; use or attempted use in the commission of a crime; penalty. Provides that restricted firearms ammunition means any ammunition that has been banned or prohibited from commercial sale by the U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives or under federal law. Under current law, restricted firearms ammunition was defined as ammunition that are: (i) coated with or contain, in whole or in part, polytetrafluorethylene or a similar product, (ii) commonly known as "KTW" bullets or "French Arcanes," or (iii) any cartridges containing bullets coated with a plastic substance with other than lead or lead alloy cores, jacketed bullets with other than lead or lead alloy cores, or cartridges of which the bullet itself is wholly comprised of a metal or metal alloy other than lead.
Title
Restricted firearm ammunition; use or attempted use in the commission of a crime, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1444S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104710D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104710D-S1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103736D |