VA SB1440 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health instruction; mental health. Directs the Board of Education to review and update the health Standards of Learning for students in all grades to include mental health. Legislation passed in 2018 required such review and update for students in grades nine and 10.
Title
Health instruction; Board of Education to review & update SOL to include mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19104194D-E |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1440E |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104194D |