VA SB1437 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Parole; exception to limitation on the application of parole statutes; investigations and reports by probation officers. Provides that a person is entitled to parole who was sentenced by a jury prior to the date of the Supreme Court of Virginia decision in Fishback v. Commonwealth, 260 Va. 104 (June 9, 2000), in which the Court held that a jury should be instructed on the fact that parole has been abolished, for a noncapital felony committed after the time that the abolition of parole went into effect (January 1, 1995). The bill also allows a presentence report to be made available for review without a court order to incarcerated persons who are eligible for release by the Virginia Parole Board, or to such person's counsel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole; exception to limitation on the application of parole statutes, investigations and reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 8-N) (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30SenateFailed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 8-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103814D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192299(n/a)See Bill Text
531165.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback