VA SB1437 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0202)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Commonwealth Council on Aging; duties. Imposes on the Commonwealth Council on Aging a duty to assist and advise the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services regarding strategies to improve nutritional health, alleviate hunger, and prevent malnutrition among older adults.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aging, Commonwealth Council on; duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0202)
2017-02-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 202 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017
2017-02-17SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17
2017-02-17SenateSigned by President
2017-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-15SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1437ER)
2017-02-15SenateEnrolled
2017-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13HouseRead third time
2017-02-10HouseRead second time
2017-02-09HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-27SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-01-27SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
2017-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N)
2017-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-13SenatePresented and ordered printed 17103468D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515128(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1437
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1437+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1437ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0202+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0030+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0122SB1437+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0166SB1437+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0169SB1437+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0170SB1437+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H12V0198+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2250+SB1437

Bill Comments

feedback