VA SB1436 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0681)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Testing persons charged with certain crimes for sexually transmitted infections. Provides that as soon as practicable following arrest, or following indictment, arrest by warrant, or service of a petition in the case of a juvenile, the attorney for the Commonwealth may request after consultation with any complaining witness, or shall request upon the request of the complaining witness, that any person charged with certain specified crimes be requested to submit to testing for sexually transmitted infections, as that term is defined in the bill. The bill provides that if the person charged refuses to submit to testing or the competency of the person to submit to testing is at issue, a court finding probable cause that the complaining witness was exposed to body fluids of the person charged in a manner that may transmit a sexually transmitted infection shall order such testing. The bill also provides that the results of such tests shall not be admissible as evidence in any criminal proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexually transmitted infections; testing of certain persons following arrest or indictment, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0681)
2023-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 681 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
2023-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-08SenateSigned by President
2023-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1436ER)
2023-03-07SenateEnrolled
2023-02-23HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
2023-02-23HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2023-02-23HouseRead third time
2023-02-22HouseRead second time
2023-02-20HouseReported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
2023-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2023-02-11HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-02-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-02-07HouseRead first time
2023-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-06SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1436S1
2023-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23105747D-S1
2023-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-06SenateRead second time
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2023-01-30SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105747D-S1
2023-01-30SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-25SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
2023-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2023-01-11SenatePresented and ordered printed 23102051D

Same As/Similar To

HB1416 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680)
HB1416 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18261.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1436
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1436+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1436S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1436ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0681+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23104613D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1436F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1436FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1436FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S03V0095+SB1436
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0267+SB1436
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0243SB1436+SB1436
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0276SB1436+SB1436
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0277SB1436+SB1436
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0801V0215+SB1436
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H08V0316+SB1436
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2272+SB1436

Bill Comments

feedback