VA SB1432 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Immobilization of vehicles. Allows the owner or operator of a parking lot or other building to immobilize a trespassing vehicle by use of any device in a manner that prevents its removal or lawful operation, provided that the device used does not damage the vehicle. Current law limits immobilization devices to those, such as a boot, that prevent a vehicle from being moved by preventing a wheel from turning. The bill clarifies that the currently authorized use of a device by a locality to immobilize a vehicle against which there are outstanding parking violations in a manner that prevents its operation means in a manner that prevents its lawful operation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; immobilization of vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 510 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1432ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15SenateTitle replaced 19106496D-H1
2019-02-15SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1432H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106496D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106496D-H1
2019-02-12HouseReported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateReported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101660D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621216(n/a)See Bill Text
4621231(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1432
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1432+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1432H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1432ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0510+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0020+SB1432
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0087SB1432+SB1432
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0122SB1432+SB1432
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1902V0025+SB1432
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0102+SB1432
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2716+SB1432
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0683SB1432+SB1432

Bill Comments

feedback