VA SB1431 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Procedure for removal of elected and certain appointed officers by courts. Sets out the procedure by which, and clarifies the reasons for which, an elected officer or officer who has been appointed to fill an elective office may be removed from office. The bill requires, among other things, that the general registrar review the petition for removal of an officer and determine its sufficiency in accordance with the uniform standards approved by the State Board of Elections and that the attorney for the Commonwealth review such petition to determine if valid grounds exist to remove the officer. If the attorney for the Commonwealth is the elected official who is subject to the removal petition, the bill specifies that the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court of Virginia is tasked with appointing an alternate attorney for the Commonwealth to receive such petition. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elected and certain appointed officers; procedure for removal by courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
2023-03-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 664 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
2023-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-08SenateSigned by President
2023-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1431ER)
2023-03-07SenateEnrolled
2023-02-22HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-22HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-22HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2023-02-22HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2023-02-22HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2023-02-22HouseRead third time
2023-02-21HouseRead second time
2023-02-17HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
2023-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2023-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2023-02-08HouseRead first time
2023-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-06SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-03SenatePassed by for the day
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-03SenatePrinted as engrossed 23100264D-E
2023-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1431E
2023-02-03SenateAmendments by Senator Surovell agreed to
2023-02-03SenateReading of amendments waived
2023-02-03SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2023-02-03SenateReading of amendments waived
2023-02-03SenateRead second time
2023-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-01-31SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2023-01-20SenateAssigned to P&E sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2023-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100264D

Same As/Similar To

HB2289 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
HB2289 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242233(n/a)See Bill Text
242235(n/a)See Bill Text
242238(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1431
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1431+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1431E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1431ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0664+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+SB1431AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1431F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1431FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1431FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S08V0059+SB1431
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0212SB1431+SB1431
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0236SB1431+SB1431
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0250SB1431+SB1431
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H1802V0018+SB1431
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H18V0071+SB1431
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2170+SB1431
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2180+SB1431

Bill Comments

feedback