VA SB1431 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; training requirements; proceedings for enforcement. Requires the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council or the local government attorney to provide, and local elected officials to complete, an online training session on the provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act. The bill requires local elected officials to complete such training at least once every two years while they are in office. The bill also eliminates the three-day notice requirement for an expedited hearing on a petition for mandamus or injunction where violations relating to the open meeting requirements of the Act are alleged. The requirement of the bill for online training for local officials has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2020.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; training requirements for local elected officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 531 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1431ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Hodges, Davis, Hope |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, DeSteph, Mason |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House insisted on amendments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1431S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104893D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104893D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #1 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103021D |