VA SB1431 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative Process Act; economic impact analysis; opportunity for comment by affected businesses or other entities. Requires the Department of Planning and Budget to revise and reissue its economic impact analysis within the time limits set forth for the Department's review of regulations at the final stage pursuant to the Governor's executive order for executive branch review if one of the following conditions is present and would materially change the Department's analysis: (i) public comment timely received at the proposed stage indicates significant errors in the economic impact analysis or (ii) there is a significant or material difference between the agency's proposed economic impact analysis and the anticipated negative economic impacts to the business community as indicated by public comment. The bill provides that the determination as to whether either such condition is present shall be made by the Department and shall not be subject to judicial review. The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill is identical to HB 1943.
Title
Administrative Process Act; economic impact analysis of proposed regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 493 (effective 3/13/17) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1431ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1431S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104957D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104957D-S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17102481D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Administrative Process Act
Businesses
Emergency Legislation
Trade and Commerce
Administrative Process Act
Businesses
Emergency Legislation
Trade and Commerce