VA SB1428 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1428
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; operation of government stores; sale of low alcohol beverage coolers. Prohibits the Board of Directors (the Board) of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority from selling in government stores low alcohol beverage coolers not manufactured by licensed distillers. Under current law, the Board may sell any low alcohol beverage coolers in government stores. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Alcoholic beverage control; operation of government stores; sale of low alcohol beverage coolers. Prohibits the Board of Directors (the Board) of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority from selling in government stores low alcohol beverage coolers not manufactured by licensed distillers. Under current law, the Board may sell any low alcohol beverage coolers in government stores. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; operation of government stores, sale of low alcohol beverage coolers.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 9-N) (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 288 (effective 1/1/22) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB1428ER) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1428ER) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 9-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed House (86-Y 9-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21102262D-E |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1428E |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (12-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21102262D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1428 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote