VA SB1428 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; modification for certain companies; grants; Page County. Adds Page County to the list of qualified localities in which a company may invest to become eligible for income tax modification. Under current law, a company is eligible for such modification if, among other things, it either (i) invests at least $5 million in new capital investment in a qualified locality and creates at least 10 jobs paying at least 150 percent of the minimum wage in a qualified locality or (ii) creates at least 50 jobs paying at least 150 percent of the minimum wage in a qualified locality. This bill is identical to HB 2776.
Title
Income tax, state; modification for certain companies, grants, Page County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 263 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1428ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (91-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102459D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 958.2:01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 405.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |