VA SB1427 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Right to breastfeed in public places. Provides that a mother may breastfeed in any place where the mother is lawfully present. Current law allows breastfeeding on any property owned, leased, or controlled by the Commonwealth.
Title
Breastfeeding in public places; mother's right.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 105 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1427ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15101438D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1499 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)