VA SB1425 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rights to resell tickets; civil penalty. Prohibits any person that issues tickets for admission to a professional concert, professional sporting event, or professional theatrical production, open to the public for which tickets are ordinarily sold, from issuing the ticket solely through a delivery method that substantially prevents the ticket purchaser from lawfully reselling the ticket on the Internet ticketing platform of the ticket purchaser's choice. The measure also prohibits a person from being discriminated against or denied admission to an event solely on the basis that the person resold a ticket, or purchased a resold ticket, on a specific Internet ticketing platform. A person violating these prohibitions is subject to a civil penalty of not less than $1,000 nor more than $5,000. This bill is identical to HB 1825.
Title
Ticket Resale Rights Act; limitations on reselling tickets on Internet ticketing platform, penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. William Stanley [R] | Sen. Richard Black [R] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Louise Lucas [D] |
Sen. Frank Wagner [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N 1-A) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0268) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 268 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1425ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N 1-A) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House (88-Y 10-N 1-A) |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1425S1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104954D-S1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104954D-S1 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103928D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 466.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 466.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 466.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |