VA SB1424 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Public Procurement Act; action against contractor's payment. Provides that any claimant with a direct contractual relationship with any subcontractor but who has no contractual relationship with the contractor, may bring an action on the contractor's payment bond only if he has given written notice to the contractor within 90 days from the day on which the claimant performed the last of the labor or furnished the last of the materials for which he claims payment. Currently the time for providing the notice is 180 days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Public Procurement Act; action against contractor's payment bond.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)
2011-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 544 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-03-06 Senate: Signed by President
2011-03-03 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-03-03 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1424ER)
2011-03-03 Senate: Enrolled
2011-02-22 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2011-02-22 House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2011-02-22 House: Read third time
2011-02-21 House: Read second time
2011-02-17 House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
2011-02-15 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2011-02-11 House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
2011-02-10 House: Referred to Committee on General Laws
2011-02-10 House: Read first time
2011-02-10 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-08 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1424S1
2011-02-07 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104895D-S1
2011-02-07 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2011-02-07 Senate: Read second time
2011-02-04 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2011-02-02 Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104895D-S1
2011-02-02 Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2011-01-20 Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2011-01-20 Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11103985D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224341(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+SB1424
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1424+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1424S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1424ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+CHAP0544+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S12V0107+SB1424
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0241SB1424+SB1424
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0292SB1424+SB1424
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H1102V0055+SB1424
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H11V0218+SB1424
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV1212+SB1424

Bill Comments 750

feedback