VA SB1422 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration; list maintenance; lists of decedents transmitted by State Registrar of Vital Records. Requires the State Registrar of Vital Records to transmit to the Department of Elections a weekly list of decedents from the previous week. Currently, this list is transmitted monthly. The bill requires the general registrars to use this information to conduct list maintenance and to promptly cancel the registration of a person on the list.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration; list of decedent transmitted by St. Reg. of Vital Records to Dept. of Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N)
2021-01-29SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N)
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-13SenatePresented and ordered printed 21102610D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242408(n/a)See Bill Text
242427(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback