VA SB1421 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1421
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0257)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0257)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Brain injury; definition. Eliminates the requirement that an injury occur before the age of 65 to constitute a brain injury as that term is used in the context of licensure of private providers of behavioral health services.
Title
Brain injury; clarifies definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0257) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 257 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1421ER) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-16 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21102298D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1421 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
HB1873 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
HB1873 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
HB1873 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
HB1873 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)