VA SB1420 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Business park electric infrastructure program. Makes permanent and amends certain provisions of the Code related to the business park electric infrastructure program conducted by the Virginia Economic Development Partnership. The bill requires that the program be conducted in the service territory or transmission zone of each Phase I and Phase II Utility and permits costs incurred by the utility in installing the business park electric infrastructure to be recovered pursuant to a rate adjustment clause approved by the State Corporation Commission. The bill also requires a utility to obtain a certificate from the Commission prior to constructing business park electric infrastructure and requires the Commission to institute a rulemaking proceeding by September 1, 2023, to establish requirements for the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business park electric infrastructure program; makes permanent and amends certain provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
2023-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 705 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-23SenateSigned by President
2023-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1420ER)
2023-02-22SenateEnrolled
2023-02-17HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HouseRead third time
2023-02-16HouseRead second time
2023-02-14HouseReported from Commerce and Energy (20-Y 0-N)
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
2023-02-10HouseRead first time
2023-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-06SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1420S1
2023-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23104668D-S1
2023-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-06SenateRead second time
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2023-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 23104668D-S1
2023-01-23SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-01-23SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2023-01-16SenateAssigned C&L sub: Energy
2023-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2023-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102041D

Same As/Similar To

HB1776 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1420
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1420+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1420S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1420ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0705+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23104668D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1420F171+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1420FER171+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S02V0029+SB1420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0223+SB1420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0248+SB1420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0243SB1420+SB1420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0276SB1420+SB1420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0277SB1420+SB1420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H23V0137+SB1420
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1971+SB1420

Bill Comments

feedback