VA SB1420 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1420
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; nonjurisdictional customers; third party power purchase agreements. Provides that for pilot programs under which an owner or operator of a renewable energy generation facility sells electricity to an eligible customer-generator through a third party power purchase agreement, both jurisdictional and nonjurisdictional customers may participate on a first-come, first-serve basis.
Title
Electric utilities; nonjurisdictional customers, third party power purchase agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 362 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1420ER) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-16 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Energy |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21102297D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1420 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
HB2034 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
HB2034 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
HB2034 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
HB2034 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)