VA SB1418 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1418

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Grants from the Commonwealth's Development Opportunity Fund; waiver or reduction of capital investment and local match requirement. Provides that, for grants from the Commonwealth's Development Opportunity Fund, capital investment and local match requirements may be reduced or waived based on the creation of telework jobs that pay an average wage of at least 1.2 times the Virginia minimum wage. Grants from the Commonwealth's Development Opportunity Fund; waiver or reduction of capital investment and local match requirement. Provides that, for grants from the Commonwealth's Development Opportunity Fund, capital investment and local match requirements may be reduced or waived based on the creation of telework jobs that pay an average wage of at least 1.2 times the Virginia minimum wage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commonwealth's Development Opportunity Fund; grants, waiver or reduction of capital investment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 8-N) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
2021-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 386 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1418ER)
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled
2021-02-19HouseVOTE: Passage (92-Y 8-N)
2021-02-19HousePassed House (92-Y 8-N)
2021-02-19HouseRead third time
2021-02-18HouseRead second time
2021-02-16HouseReported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N)
2021-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1418S1
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21104295D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104295D-S1
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-13SenatePresented and ordered printed 21102436D

Same As/Similar To

SB1418 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22621(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1418
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1418+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1418S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1418ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0386+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1418F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1418FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1418FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0045+SB1418
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0134+SB1418
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0293SB1418+SB1418
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0371SB1418+SB1418
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1101V0001+SB1418
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0023+SB1418
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1772+SB1418

Bill Comments 750

feedback