VA SB1418 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; costs of pumped hydroelectricity generation and storage facilities. Authorizes an investor-owned electric utility to petition the State Corporation Commission for approval of a rate adjustment clause for recovery of the costs of one or more pumped hydroelectricity generation and storage facilities that utilize associated on-site or off-site renewable energy resources as all or a portion of their power source and such facilities and associated resources are located in the coalfield region of the Commonwealth. The measure provides that the requirement that a utility demonstrate that it has considered and weighed alternative options, including third-party market alternatives, in its selection process does not apply to these generation and storage facilities. The construction of these generation and storage facilities is declared to be in the public interest, and in determining whether to approve such facility, the Commission is directed to liberally construe the provisions of Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; costs of pumped hydroelectricity generation and storage facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 820 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1418ER2)
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
2017-03-20SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1418ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-23SenateTitle replaced 17105528D-H1
2017-02-23SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N)
2017-02-23HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 2-A)
2017-02-23HousePassed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N 2-A)
2017-02-23HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1418H1
2017-02-23HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17105528D-H1
2017-02-23HouseRead third time
2017-02-22HousePassed by for the day
2017-02-21HousePassed by for the day
2017-02-20HouseRead second time
2017-02-16HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105528D-H1
2017-02-16HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-02-08HouseRead first time
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2017-02-02SenatePassed by for the day
2017-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02SenatePrinted as engrossed 17103515D-E
2017-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1418E
2017-02-02SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-02-02SenateReading of amendments waived
2017-02-02SenateRead second time
2017-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2017-01-18SenateAssigned C&L sub: Renewable Energy
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-01-11SenatePresented and ordered printed 17103515D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1418
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1418+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1418E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1418H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1418ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1418ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0820+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S02V0061+SB1418
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0229SB1418+SB1418
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0247SB1418+SB1418
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0262SB1418+SB1418
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H14V0138+SB1418
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2729+SB1418
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0972SB1418+SB1418
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1121SB1418+SB1418
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2922+SB1418

Bill Comments

feedback