VA SB1415 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Port Authority; Board of Commissioners. Provides that the 11 members of the Board of Commissioners of the Virginia Port Authority appointed by the Governor no longer serve at the pleasure of the Governor and may be removed prior to the expiration of a five-year term only for cause. The bill changes from nonvoting ex officio member to voting member the status of two members of the Board of Commissioners of the Virginia Port Authority appointed by the Governor, one of whom represents the Port of Richmond and is from the City of Richmond or the County of Chesterfield, Hanover, or Henrico and one of whom represents the Virginia Inland Port and is from the City of Winchester or the County of Clarke, Frederick, or Warren. This bill is identical to HB 2367. Virginia Port Authority; Board of Commissioners. Provides that the 11 members of the Board of Commissioners of the Virginia Port Authority appointed by the Governor no longer serve at the pleasure of the Governor and may be removed prior to the expiration of a five-year term only for cause. The bill changes from nonvoting ex officio member to voting member the status of two members of the Board of Commissioners of the Virginia Port Authority appointed by the Governor, one of whom represents the Port of Richmond and is from the City of Richmond or the County of Chesterfield, Hanover, or Henrico and one of whom represents the Virginia Inland Port and is from the City of Winchester or the County of Clarke, Frederick, or Warren. This bill is identical to HB 2367.
Title
Virginia Port Authority; removal of members on Board of Commissioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 818 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1415ER2) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1415ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Title replaced 17105321D-H1 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1415H1 |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105321D-H1 |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105321D-H1 |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1415S1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104445D-S1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104445D-S1 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17102133D |
Subjects
Authorities
Chesterfield County
Hanover County
Henrico County
Richmond City of
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Chesterfield County
Hanover County
Henrico County
Richmond City of
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors