VA SB1414 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1414

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Henrietta Lacks Commission; sunset. Extends the expiration of the Henrietta Lacks Commission from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2026.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Henrietta Lacks Commission; extends sunset provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 256 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-27SenateSigned by President
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-26SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1414ER)
2021-02-26SenateEnrolled
2021-02-24HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N)
2021-02-24HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2021-02-24HouseRead third time
2021-02-23HouseRead second time
2021-02-19HouseReported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateReported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101887D

Same As/Similar To

SB1414 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222543(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1414
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1414+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1414ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0256+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1414F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1414FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S10C0006+SB1414
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0100SB1414+SB1414
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0143SB1414+SB1414
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H20V0013+SB1414
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1903+SB1414

Bill Comments 750

feedback