VA SB1414 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Potomac Aquifer recharge monitoring; advisory board; laboratory established; SWIFT Project. Creates an advisory board and a laboratory to monitor the effects of the Sustainable Water Infrastructure for Tomorrow (SWIFT) Project being undertaken by the Hampton Roads Sanitation District (HRSD).
Title
Potomac Aquifer recharge monitoring; creates advisory board, laboratory established, SWIFT Project.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 58 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1414ER) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102450D |