VA SB1413 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1413
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provision of broadband capacity by Phase I or Phase II electric utilities. Makes permanent the pilot program under which a Phase I or Phase II electric utility is permitted to petition the State Corporation Commission to provide broadband capacity to unserved areas of the Commonwealth. The bill expands the program to allow for the participation of municipalities and government-owned broadband authorities. The bill provides that investor-owned electric utilities may recover costs of and revenue generated from providing broadband capacity that serves as an electric grid transformation project in areas unserved by broadband, as defined in the bill. The bill also consolidates the State Corporation Commission petition approval process into one hearing. Provision of broadband capacity by Phase I or Phase II electric utilities. Makes permanent the pilot program under which a Phase I or Phase II electric utility is permitted to petition the State Corporation Commission to provide broadband capacity to unserved areas of the Commonwealth. The bill expands the program to allow for the participation of municipalities and government-owned broadband authorities. The bill provides that investor-owned electric utilities may recover costs of and revenue generated from providing broadband capacity that serves as an electric grid transformation project in areas unserved by broadband, as defined in the bill. The bill also consolidates the State Corporation Commission petition approval process into one hearing.
Title
Phase I or Phase II electric utilities; provision of broadband capacity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 7-N) (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 9-N) (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 9-N) (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1413S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103666D-S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103666D-S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102940D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1413 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote