VA SB1412 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

American Revolution 250 Commission; report. Changes the American Revolution 250 Commission, established in 2020, from an executive branch advisory commission to a legislative branch commission. The bill provides that members previously appointed to the Commission shall continue to serve pursuant to their original appointments. The bill also creates the Virginia American Revolution 250 Commission Fund. The bill extends the Commission's sunset date from July 1, 2027, to July 1, 2032.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Revolution 250 Commission; changes Commission to a legislative branch commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
2023-03-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 656 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-23SenateSigned by President
2023-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1412ER)
2023-02-22SenateEnrolled
2023-02-17HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HouseRead third time
2023-02-16HouseRead second time
2023-02-14HouseReported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
2023-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2023-02-13HouseRead first time
2023-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1412S1
2023-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23105652D-S1
2023-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-01-31SenateRead second time
2023-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105652D-S1
2023-01-27SenateReported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2023-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2023-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101699D

Same As/Similar To

HB2415 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655)
HB2415 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222544(n/a)See Bill Text
222550(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1412
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1412+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1412S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1412ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0656+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105652D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1412F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1412FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1412FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S10V0034+SB1412
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0149SB1412+SB1412
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0182SB1412+SB1412
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H20V0085+SB1412
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1970+SB1412

Bill Comments

feedback